HB1106 (CH0001)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frick

Status:

Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017


Synopsis:Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Frick, Davis, B. Barnes, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0921
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Environment
Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Energy Sources
Armed Forces -see also- Military Department; Veterans
Auditors and Audits
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Credit
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electricians
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Ex-Offenders
Foster Care
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Indigent Persons
Industry and Technology
Investments -see also- Securities
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Minorities -see also- Women
Plumbing
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Service Commission
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Small Business
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Treasurers
Unemployment
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Veterans
Weights and Measures
Welfare -see also- Social Services
Women
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(7-702, 7-703, 7-705)
Article - State Government
(9-1A-35, 9-20B-01, 9-20B-05)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted 47
3/19/20163/17/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (92-43)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/11/20164/3/2016Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
4/11/20164/5/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/165
Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted 65
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/165
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
4/11/20164/6/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29)66
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)66
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (92-46)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House1/11/20171/11/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/17/20171/17/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
1/24/20171/24/2017Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
1/31/20171/31/2017Veto overridden (88-51)
Senate2/2/20172/2/2017Veto overridden (32-13)
Post Passage2/2/20172/2/2017Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.