HB1119 (CH0317)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317


Synopsis:Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to develop and implement the Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot Program; requiring the Program to be established in multiple regions of the State; requiring the Secretary to coordinate with specified agencies on the establishment of the internships; specifying components of the Program; establishing eligibility standards for the Program; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Secretary of Human Resources, to issue a report to committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Zucker, Wilson, James, Arora, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Bobo, Bohanan, Branch, Cane, Carr, Conway, Cullison, DeBoy, Eckardt, Gaines, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Haynes, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Luedtke, McConkey, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, F. Turner, Walker, M. Washington, and Wood
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Social Services - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Budget and Management, Department of
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Foster Care
Job Training
Reports
Sunset
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(3-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {244062/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.