HB1131 (CH0570)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring that the members of the Commission be appointed on or before a specified date; specifying the duties of the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its initial findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Hixson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0857
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, State Department of
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
Sunset
Teachers
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.