HB1139

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frush

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from requiring, attempting to require, coercing, or attempting to coerce a dealer to purchase specified goods or services from specified vendors under specified circumstances; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch licensed in the State to specify in writing to its motor vehicle dealers specified information relating to the compensation of dealers for parts and labor; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Frush
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Industry and Technology
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Warranties
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(15-207, 15-212)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
2/19/20132/19/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20132/22/2013Hearing cancelled
2/25/20132/26/2013Rereferred to Environmental Matters
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/4/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {540111/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (134-1)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013First Reading Senate Rules62

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.