HB1148 (CH0297)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or Distribution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering for sale, trading, or distributing a shark fin; exempting a specified person, museum, college, or university from the prohibition against possessing a shark fin under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations to implement the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Arora, Barkley, Barve, Cardin, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Frush, Gutierrez, Hixson, Hucker, Kach, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, A. Miller, Mizeur, Morhaim, Reznik, S. Robinson, Stein, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0592
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0393 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Hunting and Fishing
Narrow Subject(s):Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Museums
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(4-747)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {460419/1 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (119-15)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (39-5)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.