HB1149

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology - Funding

Sponsored by:

Frederick County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to annually appropriate to the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology (CREST) an amount that is equivalent to the amount appropriated to a similar regional higher education center for specified purposes and, for fiscal years 2018 through 2020, is in addition to an amount that covers start-up costs incurred by Frederick CREST.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Frederick County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Local Bills
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Federal Government
Frederick County
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Industry and Technology
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Statutes:Article - Education
(24-1002, 24-1004)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Appropriations
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments {254863/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/14/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (120-16)43A
Senate3/15/20163/15/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation44
3/16/20163/16/2016Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.