HB1157

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hucker

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance


Synopsis:Requiring collectors of specified debt to disclose in writing specified information in any communication to the debtor relating to the alleged debt; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hucker, Barkley, and Vaughn
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0432
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Narrow Subject(s):Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments
Disclosure
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Interest
Notices
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(14-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments {703993/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (106-32)55
Senate3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Finance53
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Unfavorable Report by Finance

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.