HB1159 (CH0670)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Electric Companies - Service Restoration - Special Medical Needs Facilities

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670


Synopsis:Altering a requirement that the Public Service Commission, on or before September 1 of each year, determine whether specified electric companies have met specified service quality and reliability standards; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and distribute to each electric company a list of specified special medical needs facilities, including the licensed capacity of each facility, by January 1 of each year and post the list on the Department's Web site; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Carr, Dumais, Luedtke, McDonough, Mizeur, Simmons, and Wood
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Elderly Persons
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hospices
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Nursing Homes -see also- Continuing Care; Long-Term Care
Public Service Commission
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(5-302, 7-213, 7-213.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {503590/2 Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (117-20)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {137878/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/5/20133/31/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)62
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (114-18)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.