HB1166

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Second Chance Act of 2014

Sponsored by:

Delegate Anderson

Status:

In the House - House Requests Senate Recede


Synopsis:Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield specified information relating to a conviction of the person no earlier than 3 years after the person satisfies the sentence imposed for the conviction, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision; providing that if the person is not eligible for shielding of one conviction in a unit, the person is not eligible for shielding of any other conviction in the unit; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Anderson, Waldstreicher, Branch, Cardin, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Gutierrez, Harper, Haynes, Holmes, Ivey, Luedtke, McIntosh, Mizeur, Oaks, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stukes, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, A. Washington, and Wilson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0804
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1006 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Government
Hearings
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Petitions
Privacy
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
State Employees
State's Attorneys
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20142/7/2014First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20143/17/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/17/20143/13/2014Favorable with Amendments {382112/1 Report Adopted49
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {503622/1 Rejected (44-85)49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/17/20143/14/2014Third Reading Passed (87-49)50
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
4/1/20144/1/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20143/24/2014Favorable with Amendments {538079/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/4/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)60
House4/7/20144/2/2014House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments69
House Requests Senate Recede69

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.