HB1173

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Small Business Energy Assistance Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Authorizing the Public Service Commission to establish a Small Commercial Energy Efficiency On-Bill Financing Program; specifying the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Commission to require a utility company to participate in the Program; authorizing customers to obtain a loan for an energy efficiency upgrade under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to establish standards for a qualifying energy efficiency upgrade and eligibility requirements for customers; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Arora, Carr, Conaway, Frick, George, Guzzone, Luedtke, Rudolph, Simmons, and Wood
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Alternative Energy Sources
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Interest
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Notices
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(7-309)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {873792/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/2/20133/27/2013Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 60
4/3/20133/28/2013Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (98-40)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013First Reading Senate Rules61A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.