HB1176 (CH0471)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471


Synopsis:Requiring the development, review, and approval of online courses and services to include an assessment regarding the accessibility of the online course or service to individuals with disabilities, including the blind; authorizing the State Department of Education to contract with a third party to develop and conduct specified assessments; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Bates, Bohanan, Boteler, Branch, Braveboy, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Clagett, Cluster, Davis, Donoghue, Frank, Frush, George, Gilchrist, Guzzone, Healey, Hogan, Howard, Hucker, James, Kaiser, Lee, Love, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, Myers, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Serafini, Stocksdale, Stukes, Summers, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Wood, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Blind Persons
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-1002)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {945469/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.