HB1186

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect

Sponsored by:

Delegate McComas

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding matters including methods to adopt and implement policy addressing the prevention of child abuse that may include age-appropriate curricula for students in pre-kindergarten through fifth grade; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates McComas, Cardin, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, DeBoy, Dumais, Eckardt, Frank, Glass, Hogan, Lee, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Mitchell, Otto, Ready, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Swain, Valentino-Smith, and Wood
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {752812/1 Report Adopted53A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53A
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.