HB1194

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.

Sponsored by:

Delegate Impallaria

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Correcting a reference to the Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc. for purposes of a specified property tax credit in Baltimore County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Impallaria, McDonough, and Szeliga
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0947
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore County
Emergency Bills
Homeowners Associations
Property Tax
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(9-305)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.