HB1269 (CH0060)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60


Synopsis:Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property owned and used as a principal residence by an individual who is at least 62 years old and of limited income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Elderly Persons -see also- Vulnerable Adults
Property Tax
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Tax Credits
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(9-303)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2017 4:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {545069/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (132-0)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.