HB1287 (CH0762)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on the School-to-Prison Pipeline and Restorative Practices

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission on the School-to-Prison Pipeline and Restorative Practices; providing that the purpose of the Commission is to study current disciplinary practices in Maryland public schools and examine national best practices for training teachers and principals in restorative practices and eliminating the school-to-prison pipeline; requiring the Commission to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Washington, Angel, D. Barnes, Haynes, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Sydnor, Tarlau, Walker, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {924430/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (140-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.