HB1293

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education and Health Occupations - Nurse Midwifery Program - Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly, A.

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore, in cooperation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, the Johns Hopkins School of Nursing, and the State Board of Nursing to conduct a study and make recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013, regarding barriers and obstacles to establishing additional nurse midwifery programs in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate A. Kelly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0647
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Midwives
Nurses
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Appropriations
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20133/14/2013Hearing cancelled
3/20/20133/20/2013Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.