HB1296 (CH0597)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cullison

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597


Synopsis:Authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a cease and desist order or obtain injunctive relief against an individual for taking any action for which the Board determines there is a preponderance of evidence of grounds for discipline under a specified provision of law and that poses a serious risk to the health, safety, and welfare of a patient; repealing the authority for specified persons to appeal specified decisions to the Board of Review, followed by a specified appeal; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Cullison and Frank
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0981
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Discipline
Evidence
Health -see also- Mental Health
Hearings
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Medical Malpractice
Patients
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(14-206, 14-408)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments {356680/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)48A
Senate3/19/20133/17/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {484734/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/8/20134/2/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (138-0)66
Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.