HB1297 (CH0330)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Human Resources to request a security freeze on the consumer report or a specified record of specified protected consumers who are minor children in the custody of a local department of social services who have been placed in a foster care setting in accordance with specified application procedures; requiring a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze for a protected consumer under specified circumstances and within a specified period of time; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Zucker, Arora, Barkley, Bobo, Braveboy, Burns, Clagett, Feldman, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hucker, Jameson, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McHale, Minnick, Olszewski, Schuh, Schulz, Vaughn, Walker, Rudolph, Wilson, and Frick
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0897
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Adoption
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Foster Care
Identification
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(14-1212.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {243396/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Finance50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {377777/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)60
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments65
House Requests Senate Recede65
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Senate Refuses to Recede66
Conference Committee Appointed66
Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola66
House4/8/20134/4/2013Conference Committee Appointed68
Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz68
Senate4/8/20134/7/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (44-0)69
House4/8/20134/5/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (136-0)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.