HB1302

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders

Sponsored by:

Delegate Valentino-Smith

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Authorizing certain individuals to file a petition for an extreme risk protective order with a certain court or a District Commissioner under certain circumstances; requiring a petition for an extreme risk protective order to contain certain information on the present danger including the number, types, and location of any known firearms in possession of the respondent; authorizing a judge to enter an interim extreme risk protective order to require the respondent to surrender any firearm in the respondent's possession; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Valentino-Smith, Dumais, Atterbeary, Barve, Frush, Gutierrez, Jones, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Tarlau, A. Washington, Moon, Korman, Stein, Wilkins, Gilchrist, Jackson, Beidle, Hettleman, Frick, Lierman, Lam, P. Young, Ciliberti, A. Miller, and B. Barnes
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Arrests
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
District Courts
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Evidence
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Guns
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hearings
Judges
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Nurses
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Petitions
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Privacy
Process Serving
Protection Orders
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Search and Seizure
Social Workers
Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence
Time
Weapons -see also- Guns
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(9-109, 9-109.1, 9-121)
Article - Public Safety
(5-601 through 5-610)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 16, 2018 3:13 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {822614/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88)45
Floor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85)45
Floor Amendment {903725/3 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (116-17)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48A
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {258778/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Floor Amendment {403520/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted63
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-13)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates Dumais, Morhaim, and Corderman64
4/9/20184/3/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Special Order until later this session (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 68
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50)68
Third Reading Passed (93-46)68
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 10:07 P.M.