HB1309 (CH0832)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Recycling - Special Events

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frush

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832


Synopsis:Requiring the State, a county, a municipality, or any other local government to provide a specified written statement before issuing a specified permit for a special event.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Frush, Waldstreicher, and Carr
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0885
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Recycling
Statutes:Article - Environment
(9-1712)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {470818/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/18/20173/15/2017Third Reading Passed (122-17)49
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed (40-7)59
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.