HB1366 (CH0176)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176


Synopsis:Requiring a public school student to complete, as part of a specified curricula, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation that includes hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator beginning with students entering Grade 9 in the 2015-2016 school year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Cardin, Howard, Gutierrez, Aumann, and Frush
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0503
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental Health
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Public Schools
Students
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20142/10/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
2/24/20142/26/2014Rereferred to Ways and Means
2/26/20142/26/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20143/15/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20143/12/2014Favorable with Amendments {235268/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (135-0)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {404437/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (136-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.