HB1381 (CH0608)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Adult High School Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608


Synopsis:Establishing an Adult High School Pilot Program to establish an alternative method for adults who did not graduate from high school to earn a diploma; providing that the Program is under the authority and supervision of the State Department of Education and the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, which are authorized to approve up to six pilots; requiring a pilot to be subject to the requirements of specified federal law and to provide specified accommodations; providing for a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clippinger, Lisanti, Carey, and Buckel
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0866
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Curriculum
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Ex-Offenders
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm
Notices
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Education
(9.7-101 through 9.7-110)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {853994/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {664230/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (133-3)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.