HB1389

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect

Sponsored by:

Delegate McComas

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters, including methods to adopt and implement policy addressing the prevention of child abuse that may include age-appropriate curricula for students in prekindergarten through fifth grade; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2014; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate McComas
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1186 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary   View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20142/12/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/20142/26/2014Rereferred to Judiciary
2/26/20142/26/2014Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20144/5/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/5/20143/30/2014Favorable with Amendments {242912/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/7/20143/29/2014First Reading Senate Rules63

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.