HB1399 (CH0250)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Washington County - Sheriff and County Commissioners - Salaries

Sponsored by:

Washington County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250


Synopsis:Providing that the Sheriff of Washington County shall receive a salary of the greater of $100,000 or the salary set by the County Commissioners of Washington County under specified provisions of law; requiring the County Commissioners of Washington County to set the salaries for specified local offices by local law, within a specified time frame and subject to specified conditions; providing that the County Commissioners of Washington County shall receive a specified salary; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Washington County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1046
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):County Commissioners
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Sheriffs
Washington County
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20142/12/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/20142/26/2014Rereferred to Environmental Matters
3/4/20143/4/2014Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20143/13/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/13/20143/10/2014Favorable with Amendments {670619/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/14/20143/11/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)47
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Judicial Proceedings47
4/1/20144/1/2014Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20143/24/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/4/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/5/20143/29/2014Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.