HB1401

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy Restorations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy for the planning, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy, including restoring the track and field and installing a fitness circuit, located in Rockville; prohibiting the use of the loan proceeds or matching fund for sectarian religious purposes; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Arora, and Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0921
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):Montgomery County
Private Schools
Religion -see also- Churches
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/20132/26/2013Rereferred to Appropriations
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Unfavorable Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.