HB1402

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $300,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of Orthodox Congregation of Silver Spring, Inc. for the construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Silver Spring Learning Center, located in Silver Spring; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer, Arora, and Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0922
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2014 were amended into the State's Capital budget (HB 101). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 101 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Debt (Bond Bills)
Narrow Subject(s):Child Care
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Montgomery County
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/15/20132/15/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/20132/26/2013Rereferred to Appropriations
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Unfavorable Report by Appropriations

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.