HB1462

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study a Later Starting Time for Maryland Public Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study a Later Starting Time for Maryland Public Schools; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting Task Force members from receiving compensation, but authorizing reimbursement for specified expenses under the Standard State Travel Regulations; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations relating to a later starting time for Maryland public schools; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Miller, Arora, Barve, Bobo, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, George, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hucker, A. Kelly, McMillan, Pena-Melnyk, Schuh, Stukes, F. Turner, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20133/6/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/6/20133/6/2013Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20133/25/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/25/20133/21/2013Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/25/20133/22/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)55
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/28/20133/28/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:06 P.M.