HB1463 (CH0417)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting

Sponsored by:

Delegate Frush

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417


Synopsis:Requiring a veterinary practitioner who has reason to believe that an animal that has been treated by the veterinary practitioner has been subjected to cruelty or fighting in violation of specified provisions of law to report the suspected animal cruelty or animal fighting to the appropriate law enforcement agency or county animal control agency in a timely manner; authorizing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to impose specified disciplinary actions on a veterinary practitioner under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Frush, Angel, Chang, Ciliberti, Healey, Luedtke, Malone, Robinson, Rosenberg, Saab, Vogt, and Waldstreicher
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Agriculture
Narrow Subject(s):Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc
Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Rules and Regulations
Veterinarians
Statutes:Article - Agriculture
(2-301, 2-304, 2-310, 2-313.1)
Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-424)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2017 10:59 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {760315/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (118-15)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.