HB1494 (CH0688)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - Funding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688


Synopsis:Repealing a prohibition on the use of State funds to implement specified standards for State correctional facilities.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Conway, Bates, Guzzone, McConkey, Proctor, B. Robinson, Zucker, Aumann, Beitzel, Bohanan, DeBoy, Eckardt, Gaines, Griffith, Gutierrez, Haynes, James, Jones, Mizeur, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, M. Washington, and Wood
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0876
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Correctional Institutions -see also- Patuxent Institution
Statutes:Article - Correctional Services
(8-104)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/12/20133/13/2013Rereferred to Appropriations
3/14/20133/14/2013Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {224768/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.