HB1502

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Healey

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues relating to a post-Labor Day start date for Maryland public schools; and requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Healey, Barve, Boteler, George, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, A. Miller, V. Turner, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0963
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/1/20133/1/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/12/20133/13/2013Rereferred to Ways and Means
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {555662/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted65
Committee Amendment {555662/1 Withdrawn65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (132-4)66
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013First Reading Senate Rules65
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.