HB1510 (CH0460)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties

Sponsored by:

Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460


Synopsis:Merging the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration and the Mental Hygiene Administration in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish the Behavioral Health Administration in the Department; establishing the responsibilities, powers, and duties of the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration; requiring substance use disorder programs and mental health programs to be licensed by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, with specified exceptions; repealing a specified prohibition; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations   View Committee HearingFinance   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Discipline
Discrimination
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Medical Research
Mental Health
Notices
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/27/20142/27/2014First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/20143/4/2014Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20143/7/2014Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable with Amendments {216584/2 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/2/20143/26/2014Third Reading Passed (132-0)62
Senate4/3/20143/25/2014First Reading Senate Rules59
4/7/20144/7/2014Rereferred to Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/7/20143/30/2014Favorable with Amendments {177574/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20143/31/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)65
House4/7/20144/3/2014House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (135-1)70
Passed Enrolled70
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.