HB1527

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination Laws

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Making applicable in Anne Arundel County specified provisions of law authorizing a person that is subjected to a discriminatory act prohibited by the county code to bring and maintain a specified civil action in a specified manner.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Beidle
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Human Relations
Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Discrimination
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws
Statutes:Article - State Government
(20-1202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Beidle) Adopted (137-0)43
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations43
3/22/20133/22/2013Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/2/2013Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/8/20134/3/2013Third Reading Passed (121-1)67
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013First Reading Senate Rules66
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.