HB1537 (CH0313)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Procurement - Priority of Purchasing Preferences - Individual With Disability Owned Business

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313


Synopsis:Altering the purchasing preference priority required to be given to individual with disability owned businesses by State and State aided or controlled entities when buying supplies and services.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Procurement
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Procurement
State Aid
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(14-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/19/20162/19/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/29/20163/29/2016Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {996581/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/7/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (139-0)63
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016First Reading Senate Rules61A
4/8/20164/9/2016Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/8/20164/8/2016Hearing 4/09 at 12:30 p.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/4/2016Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
House4/11/20164/7/2016Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.