HB1572

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016

Sponsored by:

Delegate Otto

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Passed


Synopsis:Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 to add the Board of Directors of the Delmarva Discovery Center & Museum, Inc. as a grantee to a specified grant; amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 to repeal the matching fund requirement for a specified grant; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Otto
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Prior Authorizations
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Emergency Bills
Grants
Museums
State Bonds
Worcester County
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2015, 2016)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/7/20164/7/2016Rereferred to Appropriations
4/8/20164/8/2016Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable with Amendments {134465/1 Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016First Reading Senate Rules63A
4/11/20164/11/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/11/20164/7/2016Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.