HB1783 (CH0014)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

21st Century School Facilities Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14


Synopsis:Altering the requirements for awarding school construction contracts; renaming the Interagency Committee on School Construction as the Interagency Commission on School Construction; requiring the Commission to develop and approve policies, procedures, guidelines, and regulations on school construction allocations to local jurisdictions in an independent and merit-based manner; establishing the Workgroup on the Assessment and Funding of School Facilities and the School Safety Grant Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jones, A. Washington, and Hayes
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Capital Budget
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appeals -see also- Judicial Review
Appropriations
Assessments
Blind Persons
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
General Services, Department of
Grants
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Interest
Investments -see also- Securities
Leases and Rent
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Local Government Mandates
Names
Partnerships
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Solicitation
Stadium Authority
Time
Treasurers
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(10-645, 10-646)
Article - Education
(2-303, 4-114, 4-126, 5-112, 5-202, 5-301, 5-301.1, 5-301.2, 5-302, 5-303, 5-304, 5-307, 5-309, 5-310, 5-312, 8-315, 4-134, 5-314 through 5-317)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(12-202, 4-809, 5-7B-07, 6-226, 7-326, 8-301)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 1:39 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/23/20183/18/2018Favorable with Amendments {604465/1 Report Adopted52A
Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 52A
3/26/20183/19/2018Floor Amendment {153725/1 (Delegate Saab) Adopted53
Floor Amendment {563124/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-85)53
Floor Amendment {763327/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (46-86)53
Floor Amendment {313924/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (48-83)53
Floor Amendment {723622/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (44-85)53
Floor Amendment {933322/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted53
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53
3/27/20183/20/2018Motion vote previous question (Delegate Lisanti) Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (92-48)54
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018First Reading Senate Rules54
3/28/20183/28/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20183/24/2018Favorable55
Favorable Report Adopted (27-15)55A
Floor Amendment {273327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (18-27)55A
Floor Amendment {283727/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {653420/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (20-25)55A
Floor Amendment {293426/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {623522/2 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (14-31)55A
Floor Amendment {403723/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {563628/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)55A
Floor Amendment {533927/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {273125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {163520/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {263921/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {413624/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-30)55A
Floor Amendment {323020/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-29)55A
Floor Amendment {493421/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-26)55A
Floor Amendment {963722/1 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (17-27)55A
Floor Amendment {533126/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-29)55A
Floor Amendment {373328/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)55A
Floor Amendment {993326/1 (Senator Jennings)55A
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted55a
3/28/20183/25/2018Floor Amendment {993326/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn56
Second Reading Passed56
3/29/20183/26/2018Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted57
Floor Amendment {653428/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-26)57
Third Reading Passed (29-14)57
House3/30/20183/23/2018Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/4/20184/4/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House4/5/20183/27/2018Veto overridden (90-48)61
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018Veto overridden (29-15)62
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 4:01 P.M.