SB0019 (CH0164)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft

Sponsored by:

Senator Jennings

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164


Synopsis:Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully shine, point, or focus the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating an aircraft; exempting specified individuals under specified circumstances from provisions of the Act; and specifying a penalty.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Jennings
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Aircraft
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Nuisances -see also- Noise; Weeds
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-807)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/24/201210/24/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2/18/20132/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/19/20132/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {648273/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/21/20132/21/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)30
House2/22/20132/22/2013First Reading Judiciary33
2/26/20132/26/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20133/27/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)60
Senate4/3/20133/29/2013Returned Passed60
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.