SB0026 (CH0632)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal Corporations

Sponsored by:

Senator Kagan

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "governmental entity" to include a municipal corporation for purposes of the Maryland False Claims Act; requiring the attorney for each municipal corporation to report annually, beginning October 1, 2016, to the General Assembly on the number of specified civil actions and the number of specified claims made by a governmental entity that are settled without filing a civil action; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Kagan, Young, King, and Peters
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Attorneys
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Claims
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Reports
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(8-101, 8-110)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate7/18/20167/18/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/4/20171/4/2017Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/14/20172/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {168375/1 Report Adopted23
Second Reading Passed with Amendments23
2/16/20172/16/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)25
House2/17/20172/17/2017First Reading Judiciary28
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (107-30)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:08 P.M.