SB0027 (CH0434)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension

Sponsored by:

Senator Astle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434


Synopsis:Repealing the limitations on the requirement to provide specified funding in specified fiscal years to the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program for specified purposes from the Environmental Trust Fund; requiring specified funding for the Corps Program each fiscal year; extending the termination date of a specified surcharge on electrical energy distributed to retail electric customers in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Astle, Miller, Conway, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Benson, Young, and Ferguson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0385
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee HearingEnvironmental Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Natural Resources - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Chesapeake Bay
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Environmental Trust
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(3-302, 8-1913, 8-1921)
Article - Public Utilities
(7-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate8/27/20128/27/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
1/28/20131/28/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20131/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {494132/1 Report Adopted14
Second Reading Passed with Amendments14
1/31/20131/31/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)16
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Environmental Matters18
3/8/20133/8/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {730513/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7)62
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.