SB0037

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing a court to order a defendant convicted of a specified charge of animal cruelty, as a condition of sentencing, to pay, in addition to any other fines and costs, all reasonable costs incurred in removing, housing, treating, or euthanizing an animal confiscated from the defendant.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Zirkin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0865
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0203 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Turtles
Birds
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(10-604, 10-606, 10-607, 10-608)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/26/201210/26/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/6/20133/6/2013Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/8/20133/8/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judiciary43
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.