SB0070 (CH0262)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports Workers

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262


Synopsis:Providing that, under specified circumstances, work that is performed by qualifying youth sports workers for youth sports organizations is not covered employment under the unemployment insurance law.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Unemployment Insurance
Narrow Subject(s):Exemptions
Federal Government
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Sports and Recreation
Unemployment
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(8-206)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/24/201610/24/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Finance
1/18/20171/18/2017Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {787670/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Economic Matters36
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/27/20173/22/2017Favorable Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed56
3/28/20173/23/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)57
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.