SB0071 (CH0012)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of Easement

Sponsored by:

Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12


Synopsis:Prohibiting, notwithstanding specified provisions of law, and with a specified exception, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation from purchasing an agricultural land preservation easement for more than 75% or less than 25% of the fair market value of the land; and authorizing the Foundation to purchase an easement for less than 25% of the fair market value of the land if the asking price is less than 25% of the fair market value of the land.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee HearingEnvironmental Matters   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Agriculture
Narrow Subject(s):Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Easements
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Real Property
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/13/20139/13/2013Pre-filed
1/8/20141/8/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
1/16/20141/16/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20141/17/2014Favorable8
Special Order until 1/20 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 8
1/20/20141/17/2014Favorable Report Adopted8A
Second Reading Passed8A
1/22/20141/22/2014Third Reading Passed (42-0)10
House1/23/20141/23/2014First Reading Environmental Matters12
3/5/20143/5/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20143/27/2014Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
3/27/20143/22/2014Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
3/28/20143/23/2014Third Reading Passed (134-0)59
Senate3/31/20143/22/2014Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/8/20144/8/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:54 P.M.