SB0071

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Conference Committee Appointed


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish guidelines for the training of employees to become trained diabetes care providers; providing the purpose of the Student Diabetes Management Program is to have trained employee volunteers available to provide diabetes care services to diabetic students during school hours and at school activities; establishing that a trained diabetes care provider providing care services is not civilly liable under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Young and Nathan-Pulliam
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0771
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0672 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Nurses
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Students
Telephones
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-438, 7-439)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate7/6/20157/6/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
1/19/20161/19/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
2/15/20162/15/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/20162/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {204832/1 Report Adopted24
Second Reading Passed with Amendments24
2/18/20162/18/2016Third Reading Passed (37-10)26
House2/19/20162/19/2016First Reading Ways and Means28
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable with Amendments {395262/1 Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments65
Senate Requests House Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Senators Young, Nathan-Pulliam, and Bates65
House4/11/20164/7/2016House Refuses to Recede70
Conference Committee Appointed70
Delegates D. Barnes, Shoemaker, and Patterson70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.