SB0082 (CH0441)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "third-party qualified elevator inspector" to require certification by a nationally recognized safety organization accredited by the National Commission for Certifying Agencies or the American National Standards Institute that ensures that the certification requires testing and grading consistent with industry recognized criteria and that any renewal of certification requires continuing education.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingEconomic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Elevators
Examinations
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(12-801)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/11/201210/11/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Finance
1/7/20131/7/2013Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
1/21/20131/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
1/22/20131/22/2013Favorable with Amendments {417179/1 Report Adopted9
Second Reading Passed with Amendments9
1/24/20131/24/2013Third Reading Passed (42-0)11
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Economic Matters13
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {883696/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/3/2013Senate Concur - House Amendment65
Third Reading Passed (47-0)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.