SB0092 (CH0398)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398


Synopsis:Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Incentive Program; requiring the Interagency Commission to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Incentive Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0968
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Harford County
Minorities -see also- Women
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Washington County
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-314)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 14, 2018 4:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/27/201710/27/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {699032/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (41-2)63
House4/6/20183/28/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/6/20184/6/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
4/9/20184/9/2018Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments {504966/1 Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/9/20184/3/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-2)68
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (45-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.