SB0101 (CH0047)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47


Synopsis:Repealing provisions of law that relate to the licensing and operation of specified amusement devices in St. Mary's County.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Fairs
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Local Laws
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(77-1 through 77-4)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2017 4:38 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20171/13/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/18/20171/18/2017Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Favorable Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed19
2/13/20172/13/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/14/20172/14/2017First Reading Ways and Means25
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)61
Senate4/3/20173/28/2017Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.