SB0103 (CH0291)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291


Synopsis:Repealing specified provisions of law that relate to trapping or shooting specified foxes or shooting or molesting specified hounds in St. Mary's County.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Dogs
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Hunting -see also- Trapping
Public Local Laws
St. Mary's County
Trapping -see also- Hunting
Statutes:Article - St. Mary's County
(54-1, 54-2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20171/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/6/20174/7/2017Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
4/8/20174/8/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (135-2)69
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.