SB0104 (CH0292)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292


Synopsis:Requiring the Animal Control Division of the Department of Emergency Services and Technology in the St. Mary's County government, rather than the county tax collector, to perform specified duties relating to the issuance and replacement of dog licenses and dog tags; and requiring the general shape of dog tags to remain unchanged from year to year.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Dogs
Identification
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
St. Mary's County
Statutes:Article - Local Government
(13-129)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:52 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/13/20171/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/27/20171/27/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20171/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted13
Second Reading Passed13
2/1/20172/1/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)15
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation17
3/30/20173/30/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.