SB0109 (CH0442)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Senator Kelley

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442


Synopsis:Listing cannabimimetic agents on Schedule I to designate controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Kelley, DeGrange, Forehand, Getty, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Pinsky, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Stone, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0267
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0076 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  Listen to Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Medical Research
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-101, 5-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/14/20131/14/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
1/23/20131/23/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/19/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {168279/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/21/20133/19/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)50
House3/21/20133/18/2013First Reading Judiciary51
3/23/20133/23/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (139-0)63
Senate4/5/20133/31/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.