SB0110 (CH0013)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Definition

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "low intensity support services" as it relates to the Low Intensity Support Services Program in the Developmental Disabilities Administration to include a child or an adult who is living in the home, or an adult who is living in the community, and who has a severe chronic disability that is attributable to a physical or mental impairment, other than the sole diagnosis of mental illness, or to a combination of physical and mental impairments and is likely to continue indefinitely; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(7-717)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/26/20151/26/2015First Reading Finance
1/28/20151/28/2015Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20152/12/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/13/20152/13/2015Favorable with Amendments {537676/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/17/20152/17/2015Third Reading Passed (47-0)24
House2/18/20152/18/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations26
3/18/20153/18/2015Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20153/31/2015Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/1/20153/28/2015Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20153/29/2015Third Reading Passed (139-0)59
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/14/20154/14/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:47 P.M.