SB0124 (CH0443)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit for Qualifying Employees - Sunset Repeal

Sponsored by:

Senator Peters

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443


Synopsis:Repealing termination provisions and altering dates of applicability for specified tax credits for employers that hire qualifying individuals with disabilities; declaring that the intent of the General Assembly is that the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, the Department of Disabilities, and the Department of Veterans Affairs make every effort to promote and market the Qualifying Employees with Disabilities Tax Credit to Maryland employers; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Peters, Astle, Brinkley, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, Edwards, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jennings, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Raskin, Simonaire, Zirkin, Jones-Rodwell, and DeGrange
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  Listen to Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Income Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Veterans
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(1997, 1998, 2000, 2003, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20131/16/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/11/20132/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {659135/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/13/20132/13/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)24
House2/14/20132/14/2013First Reading Ways and Means27
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {225063/1 Report Adopted64
Floor Committee Amendment {695369/1 Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Floor Committee Amendment {695369/3 Adopted65
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)65
Senate4/8/20134/2/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.